Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/12/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2010