Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/21/2010