Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/22/2010