Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/15/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2010