Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010