Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/15/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/15/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/20/2010