Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/24/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/26/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2010