Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/24/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/25/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2010