Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/08/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/20/2010