Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/12/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/25/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/22/2010