Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/20/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/27/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/03/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/24/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/24/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/24/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/26/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/28/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/28/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/10/2010