Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 02/23/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/26/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/26/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/12/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/20/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/20/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/26/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/28/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/14/2010