Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/19/2010