Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/14/2010