Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/03/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/24/2010