Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2010