Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/22/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/01/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/01/2010