Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/27/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/10/2010