There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Fruit and Vegetable Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to improve the health and well-being of school children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/29/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/23/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
12/16/2009Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2009Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2009Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/04/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/04/2010
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/22/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor12/16/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities02/23/2010 Referred to
House Agriculture12/16/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry03/29/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4333.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/16/2009)

Children's Fruit and Vegetable Act of 2009 - Amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to: (1) promote the use of salad or fruit and vegetable bars in schools participating in the school lunch program; (2) provide training and technical assistance to states and schools on how to do so; and (3) provide grants to states for a one-time payment to schools for the cost of setting up and operating salad or fruit and vegetable bars.

Directs the Secretary to identify and remove barriers to the equitable purchase of fruits and vegetables within the Secretary's procurement and distribution systems.

Authorizes the Secretary to use administrative funds under the Act's fresh fruit and vegetable program to provide program participants with technical assistance and national and regional training conferences that emphasize best practices.

Directs the Secretary, within two years of receiving the findings of the National Academy of Sciences' review of the National School Lunch and School Breakfast Program Meal Patterns and Nutrient Standards, to promulgate a final rule updating the nutrition standards and meal requirements for school meal programs so they are consistent with such findings.

Requires the Secretary to allocate funds to states, in proportion to each state's administrative expense allocation under the school lunch and breakfast programs, so they can award competitive grants to school food authorities for the equipment needed to prepare, process, and store food for the school lunch program.

Directs the Secretary to provide competitive matching grants and technical assistance to schools and nonprofit entities to carry out farm-to-school programs that improve the access of school lunch and breakfast program participants to local foods.