Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/04/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/22/2010