Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/02/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/2010