Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/27/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/09/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2010