There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hoover Power Allocation Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to House

Hoover Power Allocation Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Hoover Power Allocation Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Hoover Power Allocation Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To further allocate and expand the availability of hydroelectric power generated at Hoover Dam, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/27/2010Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-329.
06/08/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4219-4221)
05/28/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-502.
12/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 615.
09/27/2010SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-329.
07/21/2010SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/09/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/08/2010-2:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/08/2010-2:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4219-4221)
06/08/2010-2:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4349.
06/08/2010-2:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4219-4222)
06/08/2010-2:16pmHouseMrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/28/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287.
05/28/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-502.
05/05/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/05/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/05/2010HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
03/18/2010HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
01/04/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/16/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
12/16/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 12/16/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/16/2009 Referred to
05/05/2010 Markup by
05/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-502
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power01/04/2010 Referred to
03/18/2010 Hearings by
05/05/2010 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/09/2010 Referred to
07/21/2010 Markup by
09/27/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-329

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4349. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (09/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 8, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Hoover Power Allocation Act of 2010 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Hoover Power Plant Act of 1984 (HPPA) to modify, commencing October 1, 2017, certain statutory schedules governing contracts for delivery of hydroelectric power generated at Hoover Dam to specified localities in Arizona, California, and Nevada.

Directs the Secretary of Energy to: (1) create, from certain apportioned allocations of contingent capacity and firm energy, a resource pool equal to 5% of the full rated capacity of 2.074 million kilowatts and associated firm energy; (2) offer Schedule D contingency capacity and firm energy to new allottees not receiving contingent capacity and firm energy for delivery commencing October 1, 2017; and (3) allocate through the Western Area Power Administration (WAPA) for delivery commencing October 1, 2017, 66.7% of Schedule D contingent capacity and firm energy to specified new allottees within the marketing area for the Boulder City Area Projects.

Requires, in the case of Arizona and Nevada, Schedule D contingent capacity and firm energy for new allottees other than federally recognized Indian tribes to be offered through the Arizona Power Authority and the Colorado River Commission of Nevada, respectively. Requires Schedule D contingent capacity and firm energy that is allocated to federally recognized Indian tribes to be contracted for directly with WAPA.

Grants WAPA 36 months to complete allocation to new allottees in California.

Requires each contract offered under HPPA to: (1) authorize and require WAPA to collect from new allottees a pro rata share of Hoover Dam repayable advances paid for by contractors before October 1, 2017, and to remit such amounts to the contractors that paid such advances in proportion to the amounts paid by them as specified in a certain Implementation Agreement; (2) permit transactions with an independent system operator; and (3) contain the same material terms included in those long-term contracts for purchases from the Hoover Power Plant that were made in accordance with HPPA and are in existence on the date of enactment of this Act.

Subjects the contractual obligation of the Secretary to deliver contingent capacity and firm energy under HPPA to the availability of the water needed to produce such contingent capacity and firm energy.

Continues through FY2067 the requirements of HPPA as the exclusive method for the disposal of capacity and energy from Hoover Dam (in effect, congressional oversight).

(Sec. 3) Requires the budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, to be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.