Committees: H.R.4349 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/16/2009 Referred to
05/05/2010 Markup by
05/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-502
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power01/04/2010 Referred to
03/18/2010 Hearings by
05/05/2010 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/09/2010 Referred to
07/21/2010 Markup by
09/27/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-329