Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/26/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/22/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2010