Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/17/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2010