There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs blind rehabilitation center in Long Beach, California, as the "Major Charles Robert Soltes, Jr., O.D. Department of Veterans Affairs Blind Rehabilitation Center".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs blind rehabilitation center in Long Beach, California, as the "Major Charles R. Soltes, Jr., O.D. Department of Veterans Affairs Blind Rehabilitation Center".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/07/2010Became Public Law No: 111-164. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2010Signed by President.
04/26/2010Presented to President.
04/19/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/19/2010Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2431)
03/25/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 192).(text: CR 3/24/2010 H2267)
12/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
05/07/2010Became Public Law No: 111-164. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2010Signed by President.
04/26/2010HousePresented to President.
04/20/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/19/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/19/2010SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2431)
03/26/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/25/2010-9:13pmHouseCORRECTION TO ENGROSSMENT - Mr. Walz asked unanimous consent that in the engrossment of H.R. 4360, the Clerk be directed to make corrections, which were located at the desk, in both the text and the title of the bill. Agreed to without objection.
03/25/2010-5:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/25/2010-5:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 192). (text: CR 3/24/2010 H2267)
03/25/2010-5:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2417-2418)
03/24/2010-10:41amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/24/2010-10:31amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4360.
03/24/2010-10:31amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2267-2268)
03/24/2010-10:31amHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/16/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/16/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/19/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs12/16/2009 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/26/2010 Referred to
04/19/2010 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4360.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4360. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-164 (05/07/2010)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs blind rehabilitation center in Long Beach, California, as the "Major Charles Robert Soltes, Jr., O.D. Department of Veterans Affairs Blind Rehabilitation Center."