Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/19/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2010