Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/23/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/23/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/23/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/03/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/12/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/26/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/27/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/07/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/07/2010