Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/27/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/27/2010