Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/2010