Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/13/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/13/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/13/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/27/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/02/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/15/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2010