Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/19/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/05/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/05/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/12/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/15/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/21/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/05/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/05/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/05/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/05/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/05/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/02/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/02/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/03/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/26/2010