Text: H.R.4402 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/16/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4402

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to improve access to nutritious meals for young children in child care.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
December 16, 2009

Mr. Tonko introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Education and Labor


A BILL

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to improve access to nutritious meals for young children in child care.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Access to Nutritious Meals for Young Children Act of 2009”.

TITLE IIncreasing access to nutritious meals

SEC. 101. Child and adult care food program.

(a) National average payment.—

(1) LUNCHES AND SUPPERS.—Section 17(c) of the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1766(c)) is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “the same as the national average payment rates for free lunches, reduced price lunches, and paid lunches, respectively, under sections 4 and 11 of this Act as appropriate” and inserting “$2.88 for free lunches and suppers, $2.48 for reduced price lunches and suppers, and 45 cents for paid lunches and suppers”;

(B) in paragraph (2), by striking “the same as the national average payment rates for free breakfasts, reduced price breakfasts, and paid breakfasts, respectively, under section 4(b) of the Child Nutrition Act of 1966” and inserting “$1.66 for free breakfasts, $1.36 for reduced price breakfasts, and 46 cents for paid breakfasts”; and

(C) in paragraph (3)—

(i) by striking “30 cents” and inserting “84 cents”;

(ii) by striking “one-half the rate for free supplements” and inserting “47 cents”; and

(iii) by striking “2.75 cents” and inserting “16 cents”.

(b) A third meal option.—Section 17(f)(2)(B) of the Richard B. Russell School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1766(f)(2)(B)) is amended—

(1) by striking “two meals” and inserting “3 meals”;

(2) by striking “2 meals” and inserting “3 meals”; and

(3) by striking “, for children that are maintained in a child care setting for eight or more hours per day”.

(c) Reimbursement of family or group day care home sponsoring organizations.—Section 17(f)(3) of the Richard B. Russell School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1766(f)(3)) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (A)—

(A) in clause (ii)—

(i) in subclause (I), by striking “50 percent” each place it appears in items (aa) and (bb) and inserting “40 percent”; and

(ii) in subclause (III), by striking “the factors in effect on July 1, 1996” and inserting “$2.41 for lunches and suppers, $1.39 for breakfasts, and 76 cents for supplements”; and

(B) in clause (iii)(I)—

(i) in item (aa), by striking “95 cents for lunches and suppers, 27 cents for breakfasts, and 13 cents for supplements” and inserting “$1.53 for lunches and suppers, 64 cents for breakfasts, and 28 cents for supplements”; and

(ii) in item (bb), by striking “July 1, 1997” and inserting “July 1, 2010”; and

(2) by striking subparagraph (B) and inserting the following:

“(B) NUTRITION SERVICES AND ADMINISTRATIVE FUNDS.—

“(i) IN GENERAL.—Effective July 1, 2010 and in addition to the annual cost of living adjustment described in clause (iii), the Secretary shall raise the maximum allowable levels of the family or group day care home sponsoring organization monthly administrative reimbursement by $5 per home.

“(ii) ADMINISTRATION EXPENSES.—In addition to the reimbursement described in clause (i), family or group day care home sponsoring organizations shall receive reimbursement for the administrative expenses of the family or group day care home sponsoring organizations in amounts not exceeding the maximum allowable levels prescribed by the Secretary.

“(iii) ADJUSTMENT.—The maximum allowable levels described in this subparagraph shall be adjusted on July 1 of each year to reflect changes in the Consumer Price Index for all items for the most recent 12-month period for which such data are available with the exception of any year for which application of the Consumer Price Index would result in a decrease in reimbursement rates.”.

TITLE IIStreamlining and simplification of program and paperwork requirements

SEC. 201. Streamlining and simplification of program and paperwork requirements.

Section 17 of the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1766) is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(u) Streamlining and simplification of program and paperwork requirements.—The Secretary shall improve the ability of the child and adult care food program to reach low-income families by streamlining program and paperwork requirements, including requirements for States, sponsoring organizations, child care providers, and parents.”.