Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/05/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/05/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/21/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/21/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/25/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/26/2010