Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/15/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/15/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/15/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 01/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/19/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/21/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/21/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/14/2010