Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/02/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/26/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/30/2010