Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/16/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/25/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2010