There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend Public Law 95-232 to repeal a restriction on treating as Indian country certain lands held in trust for Indian pueblos in New Mexico.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-354. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/21/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10933-10934)
12/20/2010Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. With written report No. 111-379.
06/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 414).(text: CR 6/29/2010 H4928-4929)
06/28/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-515.
01/13/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-354. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010HousePresented to President.
12/22/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10933-10934)
12/20/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 720.
12/20/2010SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. With written report No. 111-379.
11/18/2010SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/12/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
06/30/2010-7:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/30/2010-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 414). (text: CR 6/29/2010 H4928-4929)
06/30/2010-6:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5261-5262)
06/29/2010-1:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Heinrich objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
06/29/2010-1:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4445.
06/29/2010-1:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4928-4929)
06/29/2010-1:27pmHouseMr. Heinrich moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/28/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 295.
06/28/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-515.
06/16/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/16/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/21/2010HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/13/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/13/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 01/13/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/13/2010 Referred to
04/21/2010 Hearings by
06/16/2010 Markup by
06/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-515
Senate Indian Affairs07/12/2010 Referred to
11/18/2010 Markup by
12/20/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-379

No related bill information was received for H.R.4445.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4445. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-354 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 30, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Indian Pueblo Cultural Center Clarification Act - Repeals a restriction on treating as Indian country certain lands held in trust for Indian pueblos within Albuquerque, Bernalillo County, New Mexico.

Prohibits gaming on such land.