Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/18/2010