Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2010