Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-126 (01/22/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on January 20, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Treats cash contributions made after January 11, 2010, and before March 1, 2010, for the relief of earthquake victims in Haiti as having been made on December 31, 2009, for purposes of the tax deduction for charitable contributions. Deems a contribution as meeting the recordkeeping requirements of the Internal Revenue Code if the taxpayer produces a telephone bill showing the name of the donee organization and the date and amount of the contribution. Designates the provisions of this Act as emergency provisions, thus exempting them from the pay-as-you-go requirement of budget neutrality.