Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/19/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/19/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/20/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/21/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/21/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/21/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 01/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/22/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 08/10/2010