There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members of the Armed Forces deployed in support of a contingency operation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/19/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/15/2010Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
07/15/2010Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
02/25/2010Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
01/22/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/19/2010Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/19/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/17/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/19/2010 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity01/22/2010 Referred to
02/25/2010 Hearings by
07/15/2010 Markup by
07/15/2010 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4469.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4469. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/19/2010)

Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for the protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members deployed in support of a contingency operation. States that if a motion for change of custody of a child of such a member is filed while the member is so deployed, no court may enter an order modifying or amending a previous child custody judgment, except if the court finds that it is in the best interest of the child. Prohibits any court from considering a member's absence due to deployment, or possible deployment, in support of a contingency operation in determining the best interest of the child.