Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/15/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/27/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/14/2010