Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/21/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/21/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/21/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/27/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/27/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/02/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/11/2010