Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2010