Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/11/2010