There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to House

Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the appointment of additional bankruptcy judges, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/27/2010Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
03/12/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 345 - 5 (Roll no. 111).(text: CR 3/10/2010 H1235-1236)
03/09/2010Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-430.
01/26/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
05/27/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
05/27/2010SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
05/27/2010SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/15/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/12/2010-11:26amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/12/2010-11:26amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 345 - 5 (Roll no. 111). (text: CR 3/10/2010 H1235-1236)
03/12/2010-11:14amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1375-1376)
03/10/2010-11:49amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/10/2010-11:39amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4506.
03/10/2010-11:39amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1235-1238)
03/10/2010-11:39amHouseMr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/09/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
03/09/2010HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-430.
01/27/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
01/27/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/26/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/26/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/26/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/26/2010 Referred to
01/27/2010 Markup by
03/09/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-430
Senate Judiciary03/15/2010 Referred to
05/27/2010 Markup by
05/27/2010 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4506.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4506. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (05/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010 - Amends the federal judicial code to authorize the appointment of additional permanent bankruptcy judges in various states.

Converts certain temporary offices of bankruptcy judges to permanent offices in specified states.

Extends certain temporary offices of bankruptcy judges previously authorized for Pennsylvania and North Carolina.

Increases bankruptcy filing fees.

Reduces the amount of bankruptcy fees to be deposited as offsetting collections to the United States Trustee System Fund.