Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2010